MA H678 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5073
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to hazing prevention for student athletes. Education.
Title
Relative to hazing prevention for student athletes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5073 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1536 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1512 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4819
H2265 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4819
H5073 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1512 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4819
H2265 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4819
H5073 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H678 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H678.pdf |