MA H674 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to political campaign contributions. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to political contributions
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H674 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H674.pdf |