MA H673 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4650
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal the law relative to the use of leghold traps for capturing furbearing animals. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to beavers
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4650 |
2015-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4650 (Replaced by) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1305 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1306 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2015
H2509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2876 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2507 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1305 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1306 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2015
H2509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2876 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2507 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H673 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H673.pdf |