MA H667 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the need for accessible homes for the elderly, returning veterans with disabilities and families that include persons with disabilities. Housing.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to the need for accessible homes for the elderly, returning veterans with disabilities, and families that include persons with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-14 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2017-07-10 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2017-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1938 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H1944 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4519 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1938 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H1944 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4519 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H667 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H667.pdf |