MA H651 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to promoting innovation in elder care nursing facilities and services. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to promoting innovation in elder care services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H3150 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S2117 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
H775 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Recommitted to the committee on Environment and Natural Resources
H545 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4417
H277 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2117 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
H775 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Recommitted to the committee on Environment and Natural Resources
H545 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4417
H277 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H651 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H651.pdf |