MA H65 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-14 - Read for its information
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-14 - Read for its information
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A message was received from the office of His Excellency the Governor submitting a report of the exercise of the pardoning power by the Governor, with the advice and consent of the Council from January 1, 2018 to December 31, 2018.
Title
Pardons
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read for its information |
2019-01-10 | House | Read; and sent to the Senate for its information |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H65 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H65.pdf |