MA H65 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to term limits for judges. The Judiciary.
Title
Proposal for a Legislative Amendment to the Constitution relative to the term of judicial officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on file |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on file |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass |
2013-03-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H65 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H65.pdf |