MA H65 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4533
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to cueing and supervision in the personal care attendant program. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to cueing and supervision in the PCA program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4533 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 29, 2012 |
2012-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-16 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2012-02-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4533 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H65 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11218&generalCourtId=1 |