MA H649 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-18 - Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-18 - Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create safe environments for home care workers and consumers. Elder Affairs.
Title
To improve Massachusetts home care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-18 | House | Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-12-18 | House | Accompanied by S380 |
2023-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S380 (Similar To) 2023-12-18 - Accompanied H649
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H649 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H649.pdf |