MA H645 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the annual stipend for members of the Commonwealth’s hazardous material response teams. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Increasing the annual stipend for members of the Commonwealth’s hazardous material response teams
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-08-04 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H667 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4169
H4738 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 384 of the Acts of 2016
H2255 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2473 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2256 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H4738 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 384 of the Acts of 2016
H2255 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2473 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2256 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H645 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H645.pdf |