MA H645 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the Pilgrim Nuclear Power Station located in the town of Plymouth to provide for weekly testing of its safety and alarm system. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the Plymouth Nuclear Power Plant
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-11-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-18 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2012-05-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-02-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2012 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H645 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8831&generalCourtId=1 |