MA H641 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the recall of elected officials in the town of Hanson. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to Hanson town elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-10-21 | House | Enacted |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-07-01 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2019-06-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-06-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-03-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H2348 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2329 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2329 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H641 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H641.pdf |