MA H641 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to recall elections in the town of Wales. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for recall elections in the town of Wales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-11-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-11-27 | House | Enacted |
2013-11-25 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2013-11-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-10-07 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-08-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-08-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-08-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-07-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2013 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H641 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H641.pdf |