MA H635 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to contracts for continuing care retirement communities. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to disclosing continuing care retirement community entrance fees
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-12-18 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-12-18 | House | Accompanied by S386 |
2023-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S386 (Similar To) 2023-12-18 - Accompanied H635
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H635 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H635.pdf |