MA H627 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a student tuition recovery fund for students from certain for-profit schools. Higher Education.
Title
Establishing a student tuition recovery fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-05-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-03-23 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S112 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H627 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H627.pdf |