MA H626 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4649
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a department of agricultural resources and marine fisheries. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To create the Department of Agricultural Resources and Marine Fisheries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4649 |
2015-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4649 (Replaced by) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4734 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 451 of the Acts of 2016
H323 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H807 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1211 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1212 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4734 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 451 of the Acts of 2016
H323 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H807 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1211 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1212 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H626 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H626.pdf |