MA H613 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S355

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to intensive case management for clinically complex older adults. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to intensive case management for clinically complex older adults

Sponsors

Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Sen. John Velis [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]
Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Marc Lombardo [R]
Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]
Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]
Rep. Michael Day [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-30HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-10-30HouseAccompanied by S355
2019-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S355 (Replaces) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied H613

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback