MA H610 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the financial stability of nursing facilities. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to stabilizing the Commonwealth’s nursing facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-04-01JointHearing scheduled for 04/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S369 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S351 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S360 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H606 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Accompanied S360
S352 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback