MA H604 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to routine childhood immunization reports made by schools. Education.
Title
Relative to routine childhood immunizations
Sponsors
Rep. Andres Vargas [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Margaret Scarsdale [D] | Rep. Samantha Montano [D] |
Rep. Mike Connolly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-06:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2023 from 09:00 AM-06:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-05-18 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2473 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4637 (Similar To) 2024-05-31 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2024 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4637 (Similar To) 2024-05-31 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2024 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H604 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H604.pdf |