MA H593 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include certain income levels in calculating nursing home benefits payable under the Program of All-inclusive Care for the Elderly (PACE). Health Care Financing.
Title
To support equal access to community care for elders and the disabled
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-05-23 | House | Accompanied by S617 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-04-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S617 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H593
H2887 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H1519 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2887 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H1519 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H593 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H593.pdf |