MA H586 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4476
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include decabrominated diphenyl ether as a banned hazardous substance. Public Health.
Title
Relative to public safety
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Costello [D] | Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Frank Smizik [D] |
Sen. James Timilty [D] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. George Peterson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4476 |
2011-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4476 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H586 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9227&generalCourtId=1 |