MA H582 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-06:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-06:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the protection of medical exemptions for immunizations for school attendance. Education.
Title
Relative to the protection of medical exemptions for immunizations for school attendance
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Marcus Vaughn [R] | Rep. Marc Lombardo [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] |
Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-06:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2023 from 09:00 AM-06:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-07-10 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H582 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H582.pdf |