MA H581 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2493

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to prohibiting the use of Native American mascots by public schools in the Commonwealth. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the use of Native American mascots by public schools in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-19SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2493
2021-05-17JointHearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S294 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
S2493 (Replaced by) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback