MA H580 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to medical malpractice insurance for certain dentists maintaining relationships with public health dental hygienists. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to public health dental hygienists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1238 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2517
S1169 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S1165 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H1185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H613 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1169 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S1165 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H1185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H613 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H580 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H580.pdf |