MA H58 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation has been replaced by H66
Note: Legislation has been replaced by H69

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the compensation of public officials. Temporary Ways and Means.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further regulating the compensation of certain public officials

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-02 - House - House Shall this bill pass notwithstanding veto Yea and Nay No. 6 (Y: 116 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House On Enactment Yea and Nay No. 5 (Y: 116 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #2 (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 4 (Y: 116 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House On Amendment 5 Yea and Nay No. 3 (Y: 36 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - House - House On Amendment 3 Yea and Nay No. 2 (Y: 40 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - House - House On Recommittal Yea and Nay No. 1 (Y: 35 N: 125 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-06 Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2017
2017-02-02SenatePassed over veto -see Roll Call #9 (Yeas 31 - Nays 9)
2017-02-02HousePassed over veto - 116 YEAS to 43 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 6)
2017-01-30HousePlaced in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-01-30HouseFor message, see H69
2017-01-27HouseGovernor returned to the House with veto
2017-01-26SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2017-01-26HouseMotion to reconsider negatived
2017-01-26HouseEnacted - 116 YEAS to 43 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 5)
2017-01-26SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2017-01-26HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2017-01-26HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment
2017-01-26HouseRules suspended
2017-01-26SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #2 (Yeas 31 - Nays 9)
2017-01-26SenateRead third (title changed)
2017-01-26SenateOrdered to a third reading
2017-01-26SenateNew text S16 (Spilka) adopted, as amended
2017-01-26SenateRead second
2017-01-26SenateRead
2017-01-25HouseMotion to reconsider negatived
2017-01-25HousePassed to be engrossed - 116 YEAS to 44 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 4)
2017-01-25HouseAmendment 5 rejected - 36 YEAS to 124 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 3)
2017-01-25HouseAmendment 3 rejected - 40 YEAS to 120 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 2)
2017-01-25HouseAmendment 1 laid aside
2017-01-25HousePoint of Order well taken
2017-01-25HouseAmendment 1 pending
2017-01-25HouseMotion to recommit negatived - 35 YEAS to 125 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 1)
2017-01-25HouseRead third
2017-01-25HouseRules suspended
2017-01-25HouseOrder adopted, see H66
2017-01-25HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-01-25HouseRules suspended
2017-01-25HouseBill reported favorably by the temporary committee on House Ways and Means
2017-01-23SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the temporay committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the temporary committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H66 (Replaced by) 2017-01-25 - Adopted
H69 (Replaced by) 2017-01-30 - See H58
H1723 (Similar To) 2017-10-30 - Hearing scheduled for 11/01/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
S998 (Similar To) 2017-04-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1029 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H829 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S2165 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - House concurred
S1555 (Similar To) 2017-05-26 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback