MA H578 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the maintenance of roads, bridges, beaches and other common areas in private subdivisions. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to private road maintenance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-11-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2011-10-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/01/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H578 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10229&generalCourtId=1 |