MA H573 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the payments by health care carriers. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to pre-authorization of medical and health care services
Sponsors
Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] | Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] |
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H3378 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S30 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1425 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1048 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S996 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H523 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H538 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H571 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S30 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1425 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1048 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S996 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H523 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H538 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H571 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H573 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H573.pdf |