MA H573 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3719
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to municipal election ballots . Election Laws.
Title
Relative to municipal election ballots
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3719 |
2013-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2013 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3719 (Replaced by) 2013-11-13 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3760
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H573 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H573.pdf |