MA H569 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the issuance of mortgages to persons convicted of arson. Financial Services.
Title
To prohibit the issuance of mortgages to persons convicted of arson
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H800 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S978 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H930 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H991 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3870 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S978 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H930 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H991 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3870 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H569 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H569.pdf |