MA H551 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4021
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the temporary release of persons under the care of the Department of Mental Health. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
Relative to the temporary release of persons under the care of the department of mental health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4021 |
2012-03-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2012 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
H4021 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H551 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9871&generalCourtId=1 |