MA H550 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for the establishment of senior citizen safety zones in cities and towns. Elder Affairs.
Title
Authorizing the establishment of senior citizen safety zones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-09-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-06-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Elder Affairs |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H550 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H550.pdf |