MA H5317 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-26 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-26 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Boston be authorized to establish fossil fuel-free standards for new construction and major renovation projects. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Boston to establish fossil fuel-free standards for new construction and major renovation projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S2024 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3221 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5334
H847 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3395 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S2024 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3221 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5334
H847 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3395 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5317 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5317.pdf |