MA H5291 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Somerville be authorized to establish a net zero standard for newly constructed buildings and major renovation projects. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Somerville to establish a net zero emissions standard for new constructed buildings and major renovation projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-10-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday December 16, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2022 from 04:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-09-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1596 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2022
S1734 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2021
S1340 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2021
S2225 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - New draft (Jehlen) substituted, see S3129
H1371 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H761 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H2136 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
S1734 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2021
S1340 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2021
S2225 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - New draft (Jehlen) substituted, see S3129
H1371 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H761 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H2136 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5291 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5291.pdf |