MA H5280 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5365
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - New draft substituted, see H5365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - New draft substituted, see H5365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Newton be authorized to lease the West Newton Armory for a term of years not exceeding ninety-nine years. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Newton to lease the West Newton Armory for a term of years not exceeding ninety-nine years
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Senate | New draft substituted, see H5365 |
2022-10-27 | House | New draft substituted, see H5365 |
2022-10-27 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-10-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-10-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2022-10-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2022-10-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H5365 |
2022-09-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-09-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-09-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4730 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5365 (Replaced by) 2022-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 347 of the Acts of 2022
H5365 (Replaced by) 2022-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 347 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5280 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5280.pdf |