MA H526 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4364

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to include certain compounds in the classification of controlled substances. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to controlled substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-31HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4364
2012-07-19SenateSenate concurred
2012-06-28HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday, July 31, 2012
2012-06-28HouseRules suspended
2012-06-06SenateSenate concurred
2012-05-30HouseReporting date extended to Friday, June 8, 2012
2012-05-30HouseRules suspended
2012-04-12SenateSenate concurred
2012-04-11HouseReporting date extended to Friday, April 27, 2012
2011-09-29JointHearing scheduled for 10/05/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2011-01-24SenateSenate concurred
2011-01-24HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4364 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback