MA H5234 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4992) [Local Approval Received]. January 4, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the charter for the town of Chatham

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-07SenateLaid before the Governor
2021-01-06SenateEnacted
2021-01-06HouseEnacted
2021-01-05SenatePassed to be engrossed
2021-01-05SenateBills in the Third Reading discharge report accepted
2021-01-05SenateRead third
2021-01-05SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2021-01-04SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2021-01-04HousePassed to be engrossed
2021-01-04HouseSubstituted for H4992

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback