MA H522 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4484
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent and respond to bullying of elderly and disabled residents of public or privately-owned subsidized multifamily housing developments. Elder Affairs.
Title
To prevent and respond to bullying of elderly and disabled residents of public or privately-owned, subsidized multifamily housing developments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4484 |
2015-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4484 (Replaced by) 2016-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H522 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H522.pdf |