MA H504 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require financial institutions to pay late fees upon failure to conduct electronic transfers. Financial Services.
Title
To require financial institutions to pay late fees when it fails to conduct an electronic transfer
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2646 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H568 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H564 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2957 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2980 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H568 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H564 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2957 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2980 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H504 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H504.pdf |