MA H5024 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4656
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Pocket vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Pocket vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect children, families, and firefighters from harmful flame retardants
Title
To protect children, families, and firefighters from harmful flame retardants
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Pocket vetoed | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-01-01 | House | Enacted |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-01-01 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-01-01 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2018-12-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading, read a third time and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Amended (Creem) by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2702 |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, and read a second time |
2018-12-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-28 | House | New draft of H4656 |
2018-12-28 | House | Pending new draft of H4656 |
2018-12-28 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4656 (Replaces) 2018-12-28 - New draft substituted, see H5024
H1245 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4656
H1245 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4656
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5024 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5024.pdf |