MA H5023 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2936
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - See S2936
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - See S2936
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-26 | House | See S2936 |
Same As/Similar To
S2936 (Replaced by) 2024-09-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 203 of the Acts of 2024
H4847 (Similar To) 2024-08-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5003 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H5004 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4061 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2024
H4847 (Similar To) 2024-08-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5003 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H5004 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4061 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H5023 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H5023.pdf |