MA H5021 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge in the town of Rehoboth as the 1st Lt. Craig H. Waterman memorial bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the town of Rehoboth, Massachusetts as the 1st Lt. Craig H. Waterman Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-10-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-09-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2020-09-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5021 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5021.pdf |