MA H4990 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 450 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 450 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Bourne Recreation Authority. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Bourne Recreation Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 450 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-01-01 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Bills in Third Reading report accepted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read third |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-24 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-12-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-12-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1150 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1347 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3051 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1282 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H2879 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H1347 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3051 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1282 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H2879 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4990 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4990.pdf |