MA H4988 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 291 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 291 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Plymouth be authorized to hold remote representative town meetings. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to representative town meeting in the town of Plymouth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 291 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-01 | House | Enacted |
2022-11-23 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-11-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-09-26 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-07-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-11 | House | House concurred |
2022-07-11 | House | House receded from its reference |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate NON-concurred in the reference to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government and referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
2022-07-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S460 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Substituted by a bill, see H5067
S1660 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S467 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S27 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Reported in part, see S2982
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5067 (Similar To) 2022-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 233 of the Acts of 2022
H964 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2366 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H3848 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied S1660
H4258 (Similar To) 2022-09-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 211 of the Acts of 2022
S1660 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S467 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S27 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Reported in part, see S2982
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5067 (Similar To) 2022-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 233 of the Acts of 2022
H964 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2366 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H3848 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied S1660
H4258 (Similar To) 2022-09-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 211 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4988 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4988.pdf |