MA H497 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4576

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4576
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the promotion of mental health education in public schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the promotion of mental health education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-29HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4576
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-18HouseReporting date extended to Sunday April 21, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-02-29SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 15, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-10-05JointHearing rescheduled to 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
2023-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H4576 (Replaced by) 2024-06-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback