MA H497 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4582
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to repealing the testing requirements for graduation under the Massachusetts Comprehensive Assessment System. Education.
Title
To eliminate the use of the MCAS for high school graduation
Sponsors
Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] | Rep. Gloria Fox [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Ellen Story [D] |
Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4582 |
2015-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4582 (Replaced by) 2016-08-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H497 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H497.pdf |