MA H4965 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-24 - Consolidated with H4963
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to election locations for fire district number 2 in the town of South Hadley. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to election locations for fire district number 2 in the town of South Hadley

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-24HouseConsolidated with H4963
2018-12-13HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-12-13HouseRules suspended
2018-12-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-12-10HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-11-15SenateSenate concurred
2018-11-13HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws
2018-10-29HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H380 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H390 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H377 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback