MA H4953 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representative Ashe of Longmeadow and Senator Gobi, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Brian M. Ashe and Anne M. Gobi that the state treasury be authorized to pay Armando Sousa, a former employee of the Monson Developmental Center, for services rendered to the Monson Developmental Center during the years 1977 to 1985, inclusive. House Ways and Means.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve in favor of a certain employee of the Monson Developmental Center

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-01HouseNo further action taken
2018-11-01SenateSenate concurred
2018-10-25HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-03-22HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback