MA H4953 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act relative to abandoned vessels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act relative to abandoned vessels.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-13 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2010
2010-08-05 Enacted and laid before the Governor
2010-08-04 Enacted
2010-07-31 Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2010-07-31 Rules suspended
2010-07-31 Read third and passed to be engrossed
2010-07-31 Rules suspended
2010-07-29 Ordered to a third reading
2010-07-29 Substituted for H4762
2010-07-29 Recommended new draft for H4762
2010-07-29 Reported from the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback