MA H4932 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4733
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee of conference on the disagreeing votes of the two branches with reference to the Senate amendment of the House Bill financing the general governmental infrastructure of the Commonwealth (House, No. 4733), reports recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 4932).
Title
Financing the general governmental infrastructure of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Roll Calls
2020-08-01 - House - House On Enactment state loan Yea and Nay No. 267 (Y: 155 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #283 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #283 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2020-08-01 | Senate | Enacted -- see Roll Call #283 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2020-07-31 | House | Enacted - 155 YEAS to 4 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 267) |
2020-08-01 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | House | Committee of conference report accepted |
2020-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | House | Reported on H4733 |
2020-07-31 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H4733 (Replaced by) 2020-07-31 - Reported by H4932