MA H4932 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3666
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the division of capital asset management and maintenance to lease certain Nantasket Beach reservation
Title
Authorizing the division of capital asset management and maintenance to lease certain Nantasket Beach reservation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-07-31 | Laid before the Governor | |
2010-07-31 | Enacted - 38 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See Senate Roll Call, No. 398) | |
2010-07-31 | Enacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See Yea and Nay in Supplement, No. 502) | |
2010-07-31 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2010-07-31 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2010-07-31 | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-28 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-27 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-07-27 | New draft of H3666 | |
2010-07-26 | Recommended new draft for H3666 | |
2010-07-26 | Reported from the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3666 (Replaces) 2010-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4932
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h04932.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht04/ht04932.htm |